+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7089 (Ch. 2014-149)
- Substituted HB 7089
- Read 2nd time
On April 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 05/01/14
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
On April 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/22/14, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced
- Referred to Appropriations
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed
- SPB 7084 submitted as a committee bill (SB 1674) by Environmental Preservation and Conservation
+ − Vote
August 19, 2014: Floor vote: S 1674 Filed
- Yeas: 16
+ − Sponsor
Environmental Preservation and Conservation
Type:
Primary Sponsor