+ − Summary
+ − Actions (11)
On April 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 1194 (Ch. 2021-188)
On April 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations
- Remaining references corrected to Appropriations
- Original reference(s) removed: Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security
On April 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- CS by Transportation read 1st time
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- CS by Transportation; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 03/30/21, 3:30 pm, 110 Senate Building
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Transportation; Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; Appropriations
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Amendment
282822 - Amendment (Delete All) (Replaced by Committee Substitute 3/31/2021)
Delete everything after the enacting clause and insert:
+ − Statute Amended
- 479.07 - Sign permits.
+ − Vote
July 24, 2021: Floor vote: S 1670 Filed
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor