+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2502 (Ch. 2019-116)
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government, 04/09/19, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Building
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- CS by Agriculture read 1st time
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- CS by Agriculture; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Agriculture, 03/25/19, 1:30 pm, 301 Senate Building
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On March 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Agriculture; Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations
On March 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (4)
+ − Amendments (3)
968504 - Amendment
Delete lines 101 - 102 and insert:
911876 - Amendment
Delete line 437 and insert:
608542 - Amendment
Between lines 779 and 780 insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (19)
- 487.021 - Definitions.
- 487.0435 - License classification.
- 500.03 - Definitions; construction; applicability.
- 500.033 - Florida Food Safety and Food Defense Advisory Council.
- 500.12 - Food permits; building permits.
- 500.121 - Disciplinary procedures.
- 500.147 - Inspection of food establishments, food records, and vehicles.
- 500.81 - Healthy Food Financing Initiative.
- 502.012 - Definitions.
- 502.014 - Powers and duties.
- 502.053 - Permits and fees; requirements; exemptions; temporary permits.
- 502.181 - Prohibited acts.
- 570.441 - Pest Control Trust Fund.
- 570.93 - Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services; agricultural water conservation and agricultural water supply planning.
- 590.02 - Florida Forest Service; powers, authority, and duties; liability; building structures; Withlacoochee Training Center.
- 595.404 - School food and other nutrition programs; powers and duties of the department.
- 633.406 - Classes of certification.
- 633.408 - Firefighter and volunteer firefighter training and certification.
- 828.261 -
+ − Votes (2)
July 17, 2019: Floor vote: S 1646 Filed
- Yeas: 5
July 17, 2019: Floor vote: S 1646 c1
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor