+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 735 (Ch. 2018-59)
- Substituted CS/CS/HB 735
- Read 3rd time
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/28/18
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- CS/CS by Rules read 1st time
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
On February 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On February 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- CS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/15/18, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building
On January 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Now in Rules
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- CS by Health Policy read 1st time
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On January 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- CS by Health Policy; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
On January 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 01/23/18, 3:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
On January 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On August 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health Policy; Rules
On August 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (4)
+ − Amendments (2)
278860 - Amendment
Delete lines 42 - 44 and insert:
868704 - Amendment
Delete lines 25 - 62 and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
+ − Votes (2)
May 3, 2018: Floor vote: S 164 Filed
- Yeas: 8
May 3, 2018: Floor vote: S 164 c1
- Yeas: 10
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor