+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On March 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Died in Judiciary
On March 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On January 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On January 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Judiciary; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations
On January 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Statute Amended
- 944.8033 -
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor