+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Died in Rules
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On February 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Now in Rules
- Favorable by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 4 NAYS 0
On February 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 02/18/20, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Building
On February 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability read 1st time
- Now in Commerce and Tourism
On February 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On February 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
On February 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 02/10/20, 1:30 pm, 301 Senate Building
On January 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On January 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Commerce and Tourism; Rules
On January 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (4)
+ − Amendments (2)
211178 - Amendment (Replaced by Committee Substitute 2/10/2020)
Delete lines 137 - 138 and insert:
322422 - Amendment (Withdrawn 2/18/2020)
Between lines 59 and 60 insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (10)
- 15.18 - International and cultural relations.
- 20.10 - Department of State.
- 265.283 - Definitions.
- 265.284 - Chief cultural officer; director of division; powers and duties.
- 265.2865 - Florida Artists Hall of Fame.
- 265.603 - Definitions relating to Cultural Endowment Program.
- 265.701 - Cultural facilities; grants for acquisition, renovation, or construction; funding; approval; allocation.
- 265.7025 - Definitions relating to historic programs.
- 265.704 - Historical museums; powers and duties of the Division of Cultural Affairs.
- 468.401 - Regulation of talent agencies; definitions.
+ − Votes (2)
November 17, 2020: Floor vote: S 1632 Filed
- Yeas: 5
November 17, 2020: Floor vote: S 1632 c1
- Yeas: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor