+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 14, 2020 in the House:
- Died in Messages
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- In Messages
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
On March 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
On March 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/11/20
On March 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time
- Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 03/03/20, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
On February 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations
- Favorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 4 NAYS 0
On February 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 02/17/20, 1:30 pm, 301 Senate Building
On February 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
On February 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs read 1st time
On February 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On February 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
On January 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 02/04/20, 12:30 pm, 301 Senate Building
On January 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On January 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations
On January 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Amendments (2)
548088 - Amendment (Delete All) (Replaced by Committee Substitute 2/5/2020)
Delete everything after the enacting clause and insert:
593926 - Amendment (Replaced by Committee Substitute 3/4/2020)
Delete lines 55 - 66.
+ − Statute Amended
- 11.45 - Definitions; duties; authorities; reports; rules.
+ − Votes (4)
November 17, 2020: Floor vote: S 1624 Filed
- Yeas: 6
November 17, 2020: Floor vote: S 1624 c1
- Yeas: 4
November 17, 2020: Floor vote: S 1624 c1
- Yeas: 19
March 12, 2020: Floor vote: S 1624 c2
- Yeas: 39
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor