+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1079 (Ch. 2021-225), SB 2502 (Ch. 2021-37)
- Substituted CS/CS/HB 1079
- Read 2nd time
On April 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/28/21
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 20 NAYS 0
On April 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/19/21, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
On April 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations
On April 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
On April 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government, 04/08/21, 11:30 am, 110 Senate Building
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability read 1st time
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
On March 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 03/24/21, 11:30 am, 37 Senate Building
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced
- Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Amendments (6)
104964 - Amendment (Delete All) (Withdrawn 3/24/2021)
Delete everything after the enacting clause and insert:
409402 - Amendment (Delete All) (Replaced by Committee Substitute 3/24/2021)
Delete everything after the enacting clause and insert:
859634 - Amendment (Replaced by Committee Substitute 4/8/2021)
Delete lines 135 - 143 and insert:
215548 - Amendment (Replaced by Substitute Amendment 4/8/2021)
Delete lines 183 - 364 and insert:
334084 - Substitute Amendment (215548) (Replaced by Committee Substitute 4/8/2021)
Delete lines 183 - 383 and insert:
880594 - Amendment (Withdrawn 4/8/2021)
Delete lines 363 - 383 and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (16)
- 43.16 - Justice Administrative Commission; membership, powers and duties.
- 215.971 - Agreements funded with federal or state assistance.
- 216.1366 - Contract terms.
- 287.042 - Powers, duties, and functions.
- 287.056 - Purchases from purchasing agreements and state term contracts.
- 287.057 - Procurement of commodities or contractual services.
- 287.0571 - Business case to outsource; applicability.
- 287.058 - Contract document.
- 287.1351 -
- 287.136 - Audit of executed contract documents.
- 295.187 - Florida Veteran Business Enterprise Opportunity Act.
- 394.47865 - South Florida State Hospital; privatization.
- 402.7305 - Department of Children and Families; procurement of contractual services; contract management.
- 408.045 - Certificate of need; competitive sealed proposals.
- 570.07 - Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services; functions, powers, and duties.
- 627.351 - Insurance risk apportionment plans.
+ − Votes (3)
July 19, 2021: Floor vote: S 1616 Filed
- Yeas: 6
July 19, 2021: Floor vote: S 1616 c1
- Yeas: 11
July 19, 2021: Floor vote: S 1616 c1
- Yeas: 20
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor