+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (34)
On June 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Chapter No. 2022-224
On May 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor
- Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
On March 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
On March 8, 2022 in the House:
- CS passed; YEAS 116, NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
On March 7, 2022 in the House:
- Added to Third Reading Calendar
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
On March 4, 2022 in the House:
- Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/7/2022)
- Bill referred to House Calendar
- 1st Reading (Engrossed 1)
On March 2, 2022 in the House:
- In Messages
On March 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- CS passed as amended; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
- Amendment(s) adopted (960796)
- Read 2nd time
On March 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
- CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/02/22
On February 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
On February 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/28/22, 10:30 am, 412 Knott Building
On February 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations
On February 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
On February 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development, 02/16/22, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Building
On January 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- CS by Transportation read 1st time
- Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
On January 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On January 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- CS by Transportation; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
On January 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 01/25/22, 3:30 pm, 110 Senate Building
On January 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On September 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Transportation; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations
On September 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Amendments (5)
292500 - Amendment (Delete All) (Replaced by Committee Substitute 1/26/2022)
Delete everything after the enacting clause and insert:
939530 - Amendment (Replaced by Committee Substitute 2/16/2022)
Delete line 61 and insert:
396952 - Amendment (Senate: Withdrawn 3/1/2022)
Delete line 71 and insert:
960796 - Amendment (Delete All) (Senate: Adopted 3/2/2022)
Delete everything after the enacting clause and insert:
169540 - Amendment to Amendment (960796) (Senate: Withdrawn 3/2/2022)
Delete line 91 and insert:
+ − Votes (5)
July 20, 2022: Floor vote: S 160 Filed
- Yeas: 8
July 20, 2022: Floor vote: S 160 c1
- Yeas: 11
July 20, 2022: Floor vote: S 160 c1
- Yeas: 19
March 8, 2022: Floor vote: S 160 e1
- Yeas: 116
March 2, 2022: Floor vote: S 160 c2
- Yeas: 39
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor