+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (32)
On May 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Chapter No. 2015-81
- Approved by Governor
On May 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- CS passed; YEAS 88 NAYS 28
- Read 3rd time
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
- Substituted for HB 409
On April 17, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/21/15
- Received
- Referred to Calendar
On April 8, 2015 in the House:
- In Messages
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- CS passed; YEAS 36 NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on 3rd reading
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/01/15
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- CS by Fiscal Policy read 1st time
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
On March 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- CS by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
On March 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 03/19/15, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Now in Fiscal Policy
- Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On February 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development, 03/04/15, 10:00 am, 301 Senate Office Building
On February 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
- Favorable by Transportation; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 02/05/15, 9:00 am, 37 Senate Office Building
On December 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Transportation; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Fiscal Policy
On December 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
326740 - Amendment
Delete line 18 and insert:
+ − Statute Amended
- 316.614 - Safety belt usage.
+ − Votes (5)
June 24, 2015: Floor vote: S 0160 Filed
- Yeas: 7
June 24, 2015: Floor vote: S 0160 Filed
- Yeas: 8
June 24, 2015: Floor vote: S 0160 Filed
- Yeas: 9
April 22, 2015: Floor vote: S 0160 c1
- Yeas: 88
- Nays: 28
April 2, 2015: Floor vote: S 0160 c1
- Yeas: 36
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor