+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On May 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Died in Judiciary
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 04/04/17, 9:30 am, 110 Senate Office Building --Temporarily Postponed
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Now in Judiciary
- Recommendation: Unfavorable by Special Master on Claim Bills
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On December 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Special Master on Claim Bills; Judiciary; Community Affairs; Rules
On August 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Amendment
291980 - Amendment
Delete line 66 and insert:
+ − Vote
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 16 Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor