+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On May 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- CS by Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security read 1st time
On March 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- CS by Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
On March 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security, 03/20/13, 3:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced
- Referred to Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax; Appropriations
On March 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (3)
894916 - Amendment
Between lines 44 and 45 insert:
112104 - Amendment
Delete lines 25 - 28 and insert:
255812 - Amendment
Delete lines 33 - 35 and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
+ − Sponsors (3)
Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security
Type:
Primary Sponsor