+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1239 (Ch. 2021-24)
- Substituted CS/CS/HB 1239
- Read 2nd time
On April 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/27/21
On April 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time
- Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 20 NAYS 0
On April 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/19/21, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
On April 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations
On April 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- CS by Finance and Tax read 1st time
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- CS by Finance and Tax; YEAS 6 NAYS 2
On March 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Finance and Tax, 03/31/21, 11:00 am, 110 Senate Building
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Now in Finance and Tax
- Favorable by Regulated Industries; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 03/09/21, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced
- Referred to Regulated Industries; Finance and Tax; Appropriations
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Amendments (5)
803062 - Amendment (Replaced by Committee Substitute 4/1/2021)
Delete lines 97 - 124 and insert:
129940 - Amendment (Replaced by Committee Substitute 4/1/2021)
Delete lines 141 - 279 and insert:
404422 - Amendment (Replaced by Committee Substitute 4/1/2021)
Between lines 279 and 280 insert:
509904 - Amendment (Withdrawn 4/19/2021)
Delete lines 132 - 311 and insert:
430276 - Amendment (Delete All) (Replaced by Committee Substitute 4/20/2021)
Delete everything after the enacting clause and insert:
+ − Statute Amended
- 364.0137 -
+ − Votes (3)
July 23, 2021: Floor vote: S 1592 Filed
- Yeas: 9
July 23, 2021: Floor vote: S 1592 Filed
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
July 23, 2021: Floor vote: S 1592 c1
- Yeas: 20
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor