+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On March 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Died in Appropriations
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 03/03/20, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building --Temporarily Postponed
On February 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations
On February 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
On February 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development, 02/13/20, 12:30 pm, 110 Senate Building
On February 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
- Favorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
On January 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 02/03/20, 1:30 pm, 301 Senate Building
On January 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On January 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations
On January 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (5)
+ − Amendments (2)
463870 - Amendment (Delete All)
Delete everything after the enacting clause and insert:
420932 - Amendment to Amendment (463870)
Delete lines 192 - 219.
+ − Statutes Amended (6)
+ − Votes (2)
November 17, 2020: Floor vote: S 1570 Filed
- Yeas: 5
November 17, 2020: Floor vote: S 1570 Filed
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor