+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On May 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Died in Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 759 (Ch. 2017-200)
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities, 04/04/17, 9:30 am, 301 Senate Office Building --Meeting cancelled
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities; Community Affairs; Rules
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor