+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On May 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Died in Commerce and Tourism
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Now in Commerce and Tourism
On April 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Favorable by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
On April 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 04/17/17, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Banking and Insurance; Commerce and Tourism; Rules
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (14)
- 726.101 - Short title.
- 726.102 - Definitions.
- 726.103 - Insolvency.
- 726.105 - Transfers fraudulent as to present and future creditors.
- 726.106 - Transfers fraudulent as to present creditors.
- 726.107 - When transfer made or obligation incurred.
- 726.108 - Remedies of creditors.
- 726.109 - Defenses, liability, and protection of transferee.
- 726.110 - Extinguishment of cause of action.
- 726.111 - Supplementary provisions.
- 726.112 - Uniformity of application and construction.
- 726.113 -
- 726.114 -
- 726.115 -
+ − Vote
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 1566 Filed
- Yeas: 6
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor