+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Died in Education Pre-K - 12
On January 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- CS by Community Affairs read 1st time
- Introduced
On December 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Now in Education Pre-K - 12
- Remaining references corrected to Education Pre-K - 12; Criminal Justice; Rules
- Original reference(s) removed: Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On December 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
On November 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 12/01/15, 1:00 pm, 301 Senate Office Building
On September 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 10/06/15, 10:00 am, 301 Senate Office Building --Temporarily Postponed
On September 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Community Affairs; Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Rules
On August 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Amendments (2)
975840 - Amendment (Delete All)
Delete everything after the enacting clause and insert:
605990 - Amendment
Delete lines 62 - 63 and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Votes (2)
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 156 Filed
- Yeas: 5
December 1, 2015: Floor vote: S 0156 Filed
- Yeas: 5