+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 30, 2021 in the House:
- Died in Messages
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- In Messages
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
- Read 2nd time
On April 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/21/21
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
On April 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/19/21, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
On April 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/15/21, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations
- Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
On March 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, 03/24/21, 2:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs read 1st time
- Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 03/09/21, 3:30 pm, 37 Senate Building
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced
- Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Amendments (2)
509270 - Amendment (Withdrawn 3/8/2021)
Delete lines 56 - 70 and insert:
928816 - Amendment (Replaced by Committee Substitute 3/11/2021)
Delete lines 56 - 70 and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (4)
June 2, 2021: Floor vote: S 1526 Filed
- Yeas: 8
June 2, 2021: Floor vote: S 1526 c1
- Yeas: 11
June 2, 2021: Floor vote: S 1526 c1
April 21, 2021: Floor vote: S 1526 c1
- Yeas: 39
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor