+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On February 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
On February 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- CS by Criminal Justice read 1st time
On February 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On February 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
On January 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 02/04/20, 9:00 am, 37 Senate Building
On January 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On January 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Criminal Justice; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations
On January 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Amendment
103962 - Amendment (Delete All) (Replaced by Committee Substitute 2/4/2020)
Delete everything after the enacting clause and insert:
+ − Statute Amended
- 943.0587 -
+ − Vote
November 17, 2020: Floor vote: S 1506 Filed
- Yeas: 5
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor