+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On May 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5401 (Ch. 2019-141)
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/18/19, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Not Considered
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government, 04/09/19, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Building
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government
- Favorable by Environment and Natural Resources; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Environment and Natural Resources, 03/26/19, 4:00 pm, 37 Senate Building
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On March 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Environment and Natural Resources; Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (5)
+ − Statutes Amended (14)
- 20.255 - Department of Environmental Protection.
- 258.004 - Duties of division.
- 258.008 - Prohibited activities; penalties.
- 258.501 - Myakka River; wild and scenic segment.
- 282.709 - State agency law enforcement radio system and interoperability network.
- 316.640 - Enforcement.
- 376.3071 - Inland Protection Trust Fund; creation; purposes; funding.
- 403.413 - Florida Litter Law.
- 784.07 - Assault or battery of law enforcement officers, firefighters, emergency medical care providers, public transit employees or agents, or other specified officers; reclassification of offenses; minimum sentences.
- 790.166 - Manufacture, possession, sale, delivery, display, use, or attempted or threatened use of a weapon of mass destruction or hoax weapon of mass destruction prohibited; definitions; penalties.
- 843.08 - False personation.
- 843.085 - Unlawful use of badges or other indicia of authority.
- 870.04 - Specified officers to disperse riotous assembly.
- 932.7055 - Disposition of liens and forfeited property.
+ − Votes (2)
July 17, 2019: Floor vote: S 1502 Filed
- Yeas: 5
July 17, 2019: Floor vote: S 1502 Filed
- Yeas: 10
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor