+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 767 (Ch. 2019-85)
- Substituted CS/CS/HB 767
- Read 2nd time
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 05/02/19
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
- Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/11/19, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
- CS by Environment and Natural Resources read 1st time
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 04/02/19, 2:00 pm, 301 Senate Building
- Now in Community Affairs
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- CS by Environment and Natural Resources; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Environment and Natural Resources, 03/26/19, 4:00 pm, 37 Senate Building
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On March 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Environment and Natural Resources; Community Affairs; Appropriations
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Amendments (3)
197108 - Amendment
Delete lines 19 - 24 and insert:
300132 - Amendment
Between lines 36 and 37 insert:
553100 - Amendment (Delete All)
Delete everything after the enacting clause and insert:
+ − Statute Amended
- 270.11 - Contracts for sale of public lands to reserve certain mineral rights; prohibition on exercise of right of entry in certain cases.
+ − Votes (3)
July 18, 2019: Floor vote: S 1500 Filed
- Yeas: 5
July 18, 2019: Floor vote: S 1500 c1
- Yeas: 5
July 18, 2019: Floor vote: S 1500 c1
- Yeas: 17
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor