+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On May 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Died in Education
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Now in Education
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability read 1st time
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On April 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 04/03/17, 4:00 pm, 401 Senate Office Building
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Pre-K - 12 Education; Appropriations
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Amendment
463234 - Amendment (Delete All)
Delete everything after the enacting clause and insert:
+ − Statute Amended
- 121.091 - Benefits payable under the system.
+ − Vote
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 1500 Filed
- Yeas: 6
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor