+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 1205 (Ch. 2016-143)
- Substituted HB 1205
- Read 2nd time
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/03/16
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
- Favorable by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
On February 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 02/24/16, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Now in Fiscal Policy
- Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
On February 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government, 02/17/16, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building
On February 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government
On February 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Favorable by Agriculture; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Agriculture, 02/01/16, 4:00 pm, 301 Senate Office Building
On January 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced
- Referred to Agriculture; Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; Fiscal Policy
On January 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (3)
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 1498 Filed
- Yeas: 7
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 1498 Filed
- Yeas: 6
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 1498 Filed
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor