+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1175 (Ch. 2016-234), CS/CS/CS/HB 221 (Ch. 2016-222)
- Substituted CS/CS/HB 1175
- Read 2nd time
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Retained on Special Order Calendar
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/07/16
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- CS by Appropriations read 1st time
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
- Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 16 NAYS 2
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/25/16, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
On February 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations
On January 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Recommendation: CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 6 NAYS 2
On January 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, 01/28/16, 10:00 am, 401 Senate Office Building
On January 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
On January 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Favorable by Health Policy; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
On January 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced
- On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 01/19/16, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
- Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
On January 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Amendments (5)
602790 - Substitute Amendment (234188)
Delete lines 1073 - 1077.
616578 - Amendment
Delete lines 133 - 135 and insert:
378426 - Amendment
Delete lines 364 - 366 and insert:
234188 - Amendment
Delete lines 1073 - 1077.
575020 - Amendment
Delete lines 367 - 388.
+ − Statutes Amended (24)
- 20.42 - Agency for Health Care Administration.
- 110.123 - State group insurance program.
- 212.099 -
- 220.197 -
- 381.026 - Florida Patient’s Bill of Rights and Responsibilities.
- 395.301 - Itemized patient bill; form and content prescribed by the agency; patient admission status notification.
- 395.3012 -
- 395.602 - Rural hospitals.
- 395.6025 - Rural hospital replacement facilities.
- 400.165 - Itemized resident billing, form and content prescribed by the agency.
- 400.487 - Home health service agreements; physician’s, physician assistant’s, and advanced registered nurse practitioner’s treatment orders; patient assessment; establishment and review of plan of care; provision of services; orders not to resuscitate.
- 400.934 - Minimum standards.
- 408.05 - Florida Center for Health Information and Policy Analysis.
- 408.061 - Data collection; uniform systems of financial reporting; information relating to physician charges; confidential information; immunity.
- 408.07 - Definitions.
- 408.18 - Health Care Community Antitrust Guidance Act; antitrust no-action letter; market-information collection and education.
- 409.967 - Managed care plan accountability.
- 456.0575 - Duty to notify patients.
- 456.072 - Grounds for discipline; penalties; enforcement.
- 465.0244 - Information disclosure.
- 627.0613 - Consumer advocate.
- 627.6385 -
- 641.54 - Information disclosure.
- 395.107 - Urgent care centers; publishing and posting schedule of charges; penalties.
+ − Votes (3)
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 1496 Filed
- Yeas: 8
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 1496 Filed
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 1496 Filed
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor