+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On May 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs read 1st time
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 04/08/19, 4:00 pm, 301 Senate Building
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 03/25/19, 4:00 pm, 301 Senate Building --Temporarily Postponed
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On March 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Amendment
465640 - Amendment
Delete lines 37 - 51 and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (5)
+ − Vote
June 16, 2019: Floor vote: S 1492 Filed
- Yeas: 6
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor