+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On May 2, 2014 in the House:
- Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7023 (Ch. 2014-218)
On April 28, 2014 in the House:
- In Messages
On April 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- CS passed; YEAS 36 NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
On April 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/25/14
On April 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
On April 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On April 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/10/14, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations
- Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
On March 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development, 04/02/14, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building
On March 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
On March 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- CS by Commerce and Tourism read 1st time
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On March 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- CS by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 03/24/14, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations
On February 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (4)
333198 - Amendment
Delete lines 559 - 560 and insert:
793252 - Amendment
Delete line 232 and insert:
642578 - Amendment
Delete lines 557 - 560 and insert:
890830 - Amendment (Delete All)
Delete everything after the enacting clause and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (10)
+ − Votes (4)
November 5, 2014: Floor vote: S 1480 Filed
- Yeas: 11
November 5, 2014: Floor vote: S 1480 c1
- Yeas: 10
November 5, 2014: Floor vote: S 1480 c1
- Yeas: 19
April 28, 2014: Floor vote: S 1480 c2
- Yeas: 36
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor