+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (48)
On May 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Chapter No. 2021-30
On May 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor
On May 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- In Messages
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Concurred in House amendment(s) as amended (853337)
- CS passed as amended; YEAS 40 NAYS 0
- Amendment(s) to House amendment(s) adopted (666848)
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- Added to Senate Message List
- Amendment 666848 Concur
- CS passed as amended; YEAS 111, NAYS 1
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ordered engrossed, then enrolled
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- Message sent to senate
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- In returning messages
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- Message sent to senate
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- CS passed as amended; YEAS 115, NAYS 1
- Read 3rd time
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Added to Third Reading Calendar
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Amendment 853337 adopted
- Read 2nd time
- Substituted for CS/HB 329
On April 9, 2021 in the House:
- Amendment 853337 filed
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- Bill referred to House Calendar
- Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/13/2021)
- 1st Reading (Engrossed 1)
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- In Messages
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Immediately certified
- CS passed as amended; YEAS 38 NAYS 2
- Read 3rd time
- Amendment(s) adopted (350424)
- Read 2nd time
On April 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Retained on Special Order Calendar
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/01/21
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
- Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 15 NAYS 2
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/25/21, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/18/21, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Not Considered
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Now in Rules
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Favorable by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 03/09/21, 12:30 pm, 110 Senate Building
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- CS by Regulated Industries read 1st time
- Introduced
On February 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Now in Commerce and Tourism
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On February 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- CS by Regulated Industries; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
On February 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 02/16/21, 12:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
On December 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Regulated Industries; Commerce and Tourism; Rules
On December 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (7)
+ − Amendments (6)
690554 - Amendment (Replaced by Committee Substitute 2/16/2021)
Delete lines 61 - 224 and insert:
714630 - Amendment to Amendment (690554) (Replaced by Committee Substitute 2/16/2021)
Delete lines 192 - 194 and insert:
719554 - Amendment (Withdrawn 3/25/2021)
Between lines 277 and 278 insert:
350424 - Amendment (Senate: Adopted 4/7/2021)
Delete line 264 and insert:
853337 - Strike All Amendment (Senate: Concurred as Amended 4/28/2021)
Remove lines 73-287 and insert:
666848 - S Amend. to H Amend. (853337) (House: Concur 4/28/2021)
Delete lines 7 - 272 and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
+ − Votes (7)
November 18, 2021: Floor vote: S 148 c1
- Yeas: 11
November 18, 2021: Floor vote: S 148 c1
- Yeas: 15
- Nays: 2
November 18, 2021: Floor vote: S 148 Filed
- Yeas: 9
April 28, 2021: Floor vote: S 148 e1
- Yeas: 40
April 28, 2021: Floor vote: S 148 e1
- Yeas: 111
- Nays: 1
April 14, 2021: Floor vote: S 148 e1
- Yeas: 115
- Nays: 1
April 7, 2021: Floor vote: S 148 c1
- Yeas: 38
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor