+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Died in Rules
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- CS by Banking and Insurance read 1st time
- Now in Rules
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- CS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 04/01/19, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Now in Banking and Insurance
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Favorable by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 03/25/19, 4:00 pm, 301 Senate Building
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On March 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Banking and Insurance; Rules
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (4)
+ − Amendment
560182 - Amendment (Delete All)
Delete everything after the enacting clause and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (2)
June 16, 2019: Floor vote: S 1466 Filed
- Yeas: 7
June 16, 2019: Floor vote: S 1466 Filed
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor