+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 945 (Ch. 2020-107)
- Substituted CS/CS/HB 945
- Read 2nd time
On March 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/11/20
On March 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time
- Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 20 NAYS 0
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 03/03/20, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
On February 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations
On February 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
On February 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, 02/18/20, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
On February 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
On February 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs read 1st time
On February 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On February 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
On January 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 02/04/20, 12:30 pm, 301 Senate Building
On January 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On January 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
On January 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Amendments (3)
777132 - Amendment (Delete All) (Replaced by Committee Substitute 2/5/2020)
Delete everything after the enacting clause and insert:
628406 - Amendment (Replaced by Committee Substitute 3/4/2020)
Delete lines 152 - 154 and insert:
661698 - Amendment (Replaced by Committee Substitute 3/4/2020)
Delete lines 456 - 568.
+ − Statutes Amended (11)
- 394.493 - Target populations for child and adolescent mental health services funded through the department.
- 394.495 - Child and adolescent mental health system of care; programs and services.
- 394.4955 -
- 394.9082 - Behavioral health managing entities.
- 409.175 - Licensure of family foster homes, residential child-caring agencies, and child-placing agencies; public records exemption.
- 409.967 - Managed care plan accountability.
- 409.988 - Lead agency duties; general provisions.
- 985.601 - Administering the juvenile justice continuum.
- 1003.02 - District school board operation and control of public K-12 education within the school district.
- 1004.44 - Louis de la Parte Florida Mental Health Institute.
- 1006.04 - Educational multiagency services for students with severe emotional disturbance.
+ − Votes (3)
November 18, 2020: Floor vote: S 1440 Filed
- Yeas: 6
November 18, 2020: Floor vote: S 1440 c1
- Yeas: 10
November 18, 2020: Floor vote: S 1440 c1
- Yeas: 20
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor