+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Died in Appropriations
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 03/03/16, 8:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Not Considered
On February 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
On February 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government, 02/24/16, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
On February 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability read 1st time
- Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On February 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 4 NAYS 0
On February 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 02/09/16, 10:00 am, 401 Senate Office Building
On January 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced
- Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; Appropriations
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (5)
+ − Amendments (7)
518650 - Amendment to Amendment (946636)
Delete lines 11 - 19 and insert:
931850 - Amendment
Between lines 169 and 170 insert:
946636 - Amendment
Delete lines 97 - 121 and insert:
299626 - Amendment
Between lines 158 and 159 insert:
573846 - Amendment
Delete line 165 and insert:
237312 - Amendment
Delete lines 198 - 523.
951280 - Amendment
Delete line 526 and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (5)
+ − Votes (2)
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 1430 Filed
- Yeas: 4
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 1430 c1
- Yeas: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor