+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1023 (Ch. 2022-139)
- Substituted CS/HB 1023
- Read 2nd time
On March 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/04/22
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
- Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On February 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
On February 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/28/22, 10:30 am, 412 Knott Building
On February 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations
On February 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
On February 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government, 02/16/22, 1:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
On January 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government
On January 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- CS by Banking and Insurance read 1st time
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On January 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- CS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
- Introduced
On January 13, 2022 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 01/18/22, 3:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
On January 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Banking and Insurance; Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations
On January 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Amendments (4)
179644 - Amendment (Replaced by Committee Substitute 1/19/2022)
Before line 33 insert:
157610 - Amendment (Withdrawn 1/19/2022)
Between lines 191 and 192 insert:
729540 - Amendment (Replaced by Committee Substitute 2/16/2022)
Delete lines 110 - 195 and insert:
347680 - Amendment to Amendment (729540) (Replaced by Committee Substitute 2/16/2022)
Delete line 30 and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
+ − Votes (3)
July 20, 2022: Floor vote: S 1430 Filed
- Yeas: 9
July 20, 2022: Floor vote: S 1430 c1
- Yeas: 10
July 20, 2022: Floor vote: S 1430 c1
- Yeas: 19
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor