+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 97 (Ch. 2014-108)
- Substituted HB 97
- Read 2nd time
On April 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- CS by Appropriations read 1st time
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/28/14
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
- Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
On April 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/22/14, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On February 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
On January 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, 02/06/14, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
On January 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
- Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
On January 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 01/14/14, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building
On October 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Now in Judiciary
On October 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Favorable by Health Policy; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
On September 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 10/08/13, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
On September 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health Policy; Judiciary; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
On August 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (4)
110440 - Amendment to Amendment (421220)
Delete line 21 and insert:
979050 - Amendment
Between lines 63 and 64 insert:
421220 - Amendment
Delete lines 31 - 59 and insert:
962718 - Amendment
Delete line 46 and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (4)
November 5, 2014: Floor vote: S 0142 Filed
- Yeas: 8
November 5, 2014: Floor vote: S 0142 Filed
- Yeas: 8
November 5, 2014: Floor vote: S 0142 Filed
- Yeas: 11
November 5, 2014: Floor vote: S 0142 Filed
- Yeas: 18
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor