+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Laid on Table
- Substituted CS/CS/CS/HB 1069 (Died in House returning Messages)
- Read 2nd time
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/08/18
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
- Withdrawn from Rules
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Now in Rules
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- CS/CS by Criminal Justice read 1st time
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- CS/CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 4 NAYS 0
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 02/06/18, 9:00 am, 37 Senate Office Building
On January 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Now in Criminal Justice
On January 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs read 1st time
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On January 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
On January 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced
- On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 01/22/18, 3:30 pm, 401 Senate Office Building
On January 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Criminal Justice; Rules
On January 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (4)
+ − Amendments (2)
306102 - Amendment (Delete All)
Delete everything after the enacting clause and insert:
909590 - Amendment (Delete All)
Delete everything after the enacting clause and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (7)
- 394.9085 - Behavioral provider liability.
- 397.311 - Definitions.
- 397.4073 - Background checks of service provider personnel.
- 397.487 - Voluntary certification of recovery residences.
- 397.4873 - Referrals to or from recovery residences; prohibitions; penalties.
- 435.07 - Exemptions from disqualification.
- 394.4572 - Screening of mental health personnel.
+ − Votes (2)
May 3, 2018: Floor vote: S 1418 Filed
- Yeas: 5
May 3, 2018: Floor vote: S 1418 c1
- Yeas: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor