+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On April 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Died in Appropriations
On April 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations
On April 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Recommendation: CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; YEAS 8 NAYS 3
On April 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development, 04/08/21, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Building
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
- Favorable by Transportation; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
On March 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 03/24/21, 8:30 am, 110 Senate Building
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Transportation; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations
On February 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (4)
+ − Amendment
501570 - Amendment (Replaced by Committee Substitute 4/9/2021)
Delete lines 42 - 68 and insert:
+ − Statute Amended
- 316.0756 -
+ − Votes (2)
May 16, 2021: Floor vote: S 1412 Filed
- Yeas: 7
May 16, 2021: Floor vote: S 1412 Filed
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor