+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7015 (Ch. 2013-107)
- Substituted HB 7015
- Read 2nd time
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- CS by Rules read 1st time
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/25/13
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
- Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- CS by- Rules; YEAS 13 NAYS 2
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/22/13, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Now in Rules
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 6 NAYS 3
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 04/15/13, 1:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 04/08/13, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building --Not Considered
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Judiciary; Rules
On March 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (4)
155616 - Substitute Amendment (Delete All) (871158)
04/25/2013 at 9:27 AM
871158 - Amendment (Delete All)
04/24/2013 at 4:30 PM
196848 - Amendment (Delete All)
04/24/2013 at 11:23 AM
452792 - Amendment (Delete All)
Delete everything after the enacting clause and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Rules
Type:
Primary Sponsor