+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 785 (Ch. 2017-172)
- Substituted CS/CS/CS/HB 785
- Read 2nd time
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/28/17
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
On April 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On April 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
On April 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/20/17, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
- Now in Appropriations
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
On April 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, 04/18/17, 4:00 pm, 401 Senate Office Building
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, 04/13/17, 2:30 pm, 401 Senate Office Building --Not Considered
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- CS by Health Policy read 1st time
- Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- CS by Health Policy; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 03/27/17, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Amendments (2)
374610 - Amendment
Delete lines 68 - 96 and insert:
169250 - Amendment
Delete lines 76 - 94 and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Votes (3)
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 1406 Filed
- Yeas: 7
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 1406 c1
- Yeas: 7
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 1406 c1
- Yeas: 16
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor