+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 72 (Ch. 2020-117)
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On February 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education
On February 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- CS by Education read 1st time
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On February 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- CS by Education; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
On January 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Education, 02/03/20, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
On January 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On January 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations
On January 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Amendment
312448 - Amendment (Replaced by Committee Substitute 2/3/2020)
Delete lines 97 - 144 and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (5)
+ − Vote
November 17, 2020: Floor vote: S 1402 Filed
- Yeas: 6
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor