+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (42)
On March 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Chapter No. 2018-81
On March 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor
On March 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
On March 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ordered engrossed, then enrolled
On March 9, 2018 in the House:
- CS passed as amended; YEAS 109 NAYS 1
- Concurred in Senate amendment(s) to House amendment(s) (756720)
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- In returning messages
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- CS passed as amended; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
- Concurred in House amendment(s) as amended (923493)
- Amendment(s) to House amendment(s) adopted (756720)
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- In returning messages
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- CS passed as amended; YEAS 108 NAYS 2
- Read 3rd time
- Amendment(s) adopted (186227, 951669)
- Read 2nd time
- Substituted for CS/HB 335
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Received
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/14/18
- Referred to Calendar
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- In Messages
On January 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read 3rd time
- CS passed; YEAS 37 NAYS 0
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
On January 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 01/24/18
On January 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- CS/CS by Rules read 1st time
On January 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
On January 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On January 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- CS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
On January 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- CS by Judiciary read 1st time
- Introduced
On January 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Rules, 01/11/18, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building
On November 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Now in Rules
On November 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Favorable by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
On November 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 11/13/17, 4:00 pm, 401 Senate Office Building
- On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 11/06/17, 4:00 pm, 401 Senate Office Building --Meeting cancelled
On October 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Now in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
On October 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On October 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- CS by Judiciary; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
On October 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 10/24/17, 3:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
On August 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Judiciary; Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Rules
On August 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (7)
+ − Amendments (6)
756720 - S Amend. to H Amend. (923493)
Delete lines 5 - 44 and insert:
923493 - Strike All Amendment
Remove everything after the enacting clause and insert:
186227 - Strike All Amendment
Remove everything after the enacting clause and insert:
951669 - Amendment to Amendment (186227)
Remove lines 17-19 and insert:
267844 - Amendment
Delete lines 99 - 100 and insert:
765610 - Amendment (Delete All)
Delete everything after the enacting clause and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Votes (8)
May 23, 2018: Floor vote: S 140 Filed
- Yeas: 8
May 23, 2018: Floor vote: S 140 c1
- Yeas: 6
May 23, 2018: Floor vote: S 140 c1
- Yeas: 11
March 9, 2018: Floor vote: S 140 c2
- Yeas: 109
- Nays: 1
March 5, 2018: Floor vote: S 140 c2
- Yeas: 38
February 14, 2018: Floor vote: S 140 c2
- Yeas: 108
- Nays: 2
January 31, 2018: Floor vote: S 140 c2
- Yeas: 31
January 31, 2018: Floor vote: S 140 c2
- Yeas: 37
+ − Sponsors (33)
Type:
Primary Sponsor