+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (37)
On April 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Chapter No. 2020-11
On April 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
- Approved by Governor
On March 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- CS passed; YEAS 82 NAYS 34
- Read 3rd time
On March 10, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/10/20
On March 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- CS passed as amended; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- Received
- In Messages
- Referred to Calendar
On March 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Ordered engrossed
- Amendment(s) adopted (918342)
- Read 2nd time
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/20
On January 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- CS/CS/CS by Rules read 1st time
On January 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
On January 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
- CS/CS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
On January 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- CS/CS by Banking and Insurance read 1st time
- CS by Community Affairs read 1st time
- Introduced
On January 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Rules, 01/15/20, 8:30 am, 110 Senate Building
On December 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Now in Rules
On December 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On December 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- CS/CS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
On December 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 12/10/19, 2:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
On November 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Now in Banking and Insurance
On November 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On November 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 4 NAYS 0
On October 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 11/04/19, 4:00 pm, 301 Senate Building
On September 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Community Affairs; Banking and Insurance; Rules
On August 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Amendments (5)
563010 - Amendment (Replaced by Committee Substitute 11/5/2019)
Delete lines 17 - 24 and insert:
726310 - Amendment (Replaced by Committee Substitute 12/10/2019)
Delete line 20 and insert:
228654 - Amendment (Replaced by Committee Substitute 1/15/2020)
Delete lines 16 - 18 and insert:
546622 - Amendment (Senate: Replaced by Substitute Amendment 3/6/2020)
Between lines 24 and 25 insert:
918342 - Substitute Amendment (546622) (Senate: Adopted 3/6/2020)
Between lines 24 and 25 insert:
+ − Statute Amended
- 791.08 -
+ − Votes (5)
November 17, 2020: Floor vote: S 140 Filed
- Yeas: 4
November 17, 2020: Floor vote: S 140 c1
- Yeas: 6
November 17, 2020: Floor vote: S 140 c2
- Yeas: 16
March 11, 2020: Floor vote: S 140 e1
- Yeas: 82
- Nays: 34
March 9, 2020: Floor vote: S 140 e1
- Yeas: 39
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor