+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
On March 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On February 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
- Favorable by Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
On January 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security, 02/01/22, 3:30 pm, 37 Senate Building
On January 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On January 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations
On January 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Statute Amended
- 250.10 - Appointment and duties of the Adjutant General.
+ − Vote
March 16, 2022: Floor vote: S 1396 Filed
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor