+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7027 (Ch. 2016-181), CS/CS/HB 7061 (Ch. 2016-239)
- Substituted CS/CS/HB 7061
- Read 2nd time
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Retained on Special Order Calendar
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/09/16
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time
- Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 03/01/16, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
On February 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
On February 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development, 02/17/16, 10:00 am, 301 Senate Office Building
On February 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- CS by Transportation read 1st time
On January 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- CS by Transportation; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
On January 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 01/27/16, 1:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building
On January 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced
- Referred to Transportation; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Amendments (19)
566218 - Amendment
Between lines 378 and 379 insert:
911814 - Amendment
Between lines 378 and 379 insert:
311800 - Amendment
Between lines 389 and 390 insert:
797340 - Amendment to Amendment (311800)
Delete lines 26 - 28 and insert:
671458 - Amendment
Between lines 353 and 354 insert:
129630 - Amendment
Between lines 866 and 867 insert:
929038 - Amendment
Between lines 293 and 294 insert:
826082 - Substitute Amendment (152974)
Delete lines 83 - 117 and insert:
388858 - Substitute Amendment (152974)
Delete lines 83 - 165 and insert:
152974 - Amendment
Delete lines 92 - 111 and insert:
417088 - Amendment
Delete lines 169 - 175 and insert:
337938 - Substitute Amendment (557494)
Between lines 351 and 352 insert:
495952 - Amendment
Delete lines 213 - 226 and insert:
952892 - Amendment
Delete lines 227 - 237 and insert:
695276 - Amendment
Delete lines 164 - 180 and insert:
232426 - Amendment
Between lines 226 and 227 insert:
227864 - Amendment
Between lines 226 and 227 insert:
557494 - Amendment
Between lines 351 and 352 insert:
772324 - Amendment
Between lines 331 and 332 insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (27)
- 316.003 - Definitions.
- 316.0745 - Uniform signals and devices.
- 316.0895 - Following too closely.
- 316.303 - Television receivers.
- 316.85 - Autonomous vehicles; operation.
- 316.86 - Operation of vehicles equipped with autonomous technology on roads for testing purposes; financial responsibility; exemption from liability for manufacturer when third party converts vehicle.
- 319.145 - Autonomous vehicles.
- 338.165 - Continuation of tolls.
- 338.231 - Turnpike tolls, fixing; pledge of tolls and other revenues.
- 339.175 - Metropolitan planning organization.
- 339.64 - Strategic Intermodal System Plan.
- 341.0532 - Statewide transportation corridors.
- 332.08 - Additional powers.
- 338.155 - Payment of toll on toll facilities required; exemptions.
- 339.2818 - Small County Outreach Program.
- 348.565 - Revenue bonds for specified projects.
- 311.12 - Seaport security.
- 316.235 - Additional lighting equipment.
- 316.640 - Enforcement.
- 320.525 - Port vehicles and equipment; definition; exemption.
- 335.085 -
- 337.0261 - Construction aggregate materials.
- 337.18 - Surety bonds for construction or maintenance contracts; requirement with respect to contract award; bond requirements; defaults; damage assessments.
- 339.55 - State-funded infrastructure bank.
- 343.92 - Tampa Bay Area Regional Transportation Authority.
- 343.922 - Powers and duties.
- 479.16 - Signs for which permits are not required.
+ − Votes (3)
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 1392 Filed
- Yeas: 7
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 1392 c1
- Yeas: 8
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 1392 c1
- Yeas: 18
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor