+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On May 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5601 (Ch. 2014-38)
On April 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
On April 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax, 04/09/14, 1:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building
On March 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- CS by Banking and Insurance read 1st time
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- CS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 10 NAYS 1
On March 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 03/19/14, 11:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced
- Referred to Banking and Insurance; Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax; Appropriations
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
440072 - Amendment
Delete line 57 and insert:
880184 - Amendment (Delete All)
Delete everything after the enacting clause and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (2)
November 5, 2014: Floor vote: S 1390 Filed
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 1
November 5, 2014: Floor vote: S 1390 c1
- Yeas: 10
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor