+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On April 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Died in Judiciary, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS for HB 421 & HB 1101 (Ch. 2021-203)
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 03/22/21, 3:30 pm, 412 Knott Building --Not Considered
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Judiciary; Community Affairs; Rules
On February 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analysis
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor