+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Died in Rules, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1005 (Ch. 2020-109)
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On February 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- CS/CS by Judiciary read 1st time
- On Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/02/20, 12:00 pm, 110 Senate Building --Not Considered
On February 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Now in Rules
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On February 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- CS/CS by Judiciary; YEAS 3 NAYS 2
On February 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 02/19/20, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Building
On February 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- CS by Ethics and Elections read 1st time
- Now in Judiciary
On February 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On February 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- CS by Ethics and Elections; YEAS 6 NAYS 1
On January 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Ethics and Elections, 02/03/20, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
On January 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On January 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ethics and Elections; Judiciary; Rules
On January 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (5)
+ − Amendments (8)
169522 - Amendment (Delete All) (Replaced by Committee Substitute 2/4/2020)
Delete everything after the enacting clause and insert:
402364 - Amendment to Amendment (169522) (Replaced by Committee Substitute 2/4/2020)
Between lines 22 and 23 insert:
807962 - Amendment to Amendment (169522) (Replaced by Committee Substitute 2/4/2020)
Between lines 130 and 131 insert:
885904 - Amendment (Replaced by Committee Substitute 2/20/2020)
Delete lines 176 - 185 and insert:
883168 - Amendment (Delete All)
Delete everything after the enacting clause and insert:
870312 - Amendment to Amendment (883168) (Withdrawn 3/2/2020)
Delete lines 22 - 24 and insert:
626332 - Amendment to Amendment (883168)
Delete lines 139 - 159.
194602 - Amendment to Amendment (883168)
Delete lines 158 - 159 and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (9)
- 101.043 - Identification required at polls.
- 101.131 - Watchers at polls.
- 101.5612 - Testing of tabulating equipment.
- 101.5614 - Canvass of returns.
- 101.6103 - Mail ballot election procedure.
- 103.091 - Political parties.
- 104.0616 - Vote-by-mail ballots and voting; violations.
- 106.08 - Contributions; limitations on.
- 901.15 - When arrest by officer without warrant is lawful.
+ − Votes (2)
November 17, 2020: Floor vote: S 1372 Filed
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
November 17, 2020: Floor vote: S 1372 c1
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor