+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On March 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7029 (Ch. 2016-237)
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 03/03/16, 8:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Not Considered
On February 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Recommendation: CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; YEAS 5 NAYS 2
On February 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Education, 02/24/16, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
On February 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Education, 02/17/16, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Temporarily Postponed
On January 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education
- Favorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 4 NAYS 0
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 01/26/16, 9:00 am, 401 Senate Office Building
On January 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On January 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations
On January 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (5)
+ − Amendments (2)
926712 - Substitute Amendment (Delete All) (127046)
Delete everything after the enacting clause and insert:
127046 - Amendment (Delete All)
Delete everything after the enacting clause and insert:
+ − Statute Amended
- 1012.33 - Contracts with instructional staff, supervisors, and school principals.
+ − Votes (2)
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 1356 Filed
- Yeas: 4
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 1356 Filed
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor