+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On May 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government
- Favorable by Environment and Natural Resources; YEAS 4 NAYS 0
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Environment and Natural Resources, 04/02/19, 2:00 pm, 37 Senate Building
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On March 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Environment and Natural Resources; Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations
On February 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Statute Amended
- 373.4131 - Statewide environmental resource permitting rules.
+ − Vote
June 16, 2019: Floor vote: S 1344 Filed
- Yeas: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor