+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1313 (Ch. 2021-235), CS/HB 1315 (Ch. 2021-236)
- Substituted CS/HB 1313
- Read 2nd time
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- CS by Rules read 1st time
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/22/21
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
- Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- CS by- Rules; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/20/21, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Now in Rules
- Favorable by Appropriations; YEAS 20 NAYS 0
On April 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/19/21, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
On April 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/15/21, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Favorable by Transportation; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
On March 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 03/10/21, 8:00 am, 110 Senate Building
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Transportation; Appropriations; Rules
On February 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Amendments (4)
744864 - Amendment (Replaced by Committee Substitute 4/21/2021)
Delete line 130 and insert:
384118 - Amendment (Withdrawn 4/21/2021)
Between lines 154 and 155 insert:
564816 - Amendment (Unfavorable 4/21/2021)
Between lines 154 and 155 insert:
802498 - Amendment to Amendment (564816) (Unfavorable 4/21/2021)
Delete line 105 and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
+ − Votes (3)
July 24, 2021: Floor vote: S 1324 Filed
- Yeas: 7
July 24, 2021: Floor vote: S 1324 Filed
July 24, 2021: Floor vote: S 1324 Filed
- Yeas: 17
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor