+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On May 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Died in Agriculture
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Agriculture, 04/01/13, 12:15 pm, 301 Senate Office Building --Amendment Adopted - Temporarily Postponed
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Agriculture; Community Affairs; Judiciary
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
552886 - Amendment (Delete All)
Delete everything after the enacting clause and insert:
+ − Statute Amended
- 828.27 - Local animal control or cruelty ordinances; penalty.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor