+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Died in Rules
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On April 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Now in Rules
- Favorable by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
On April 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 04/17/17, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Now in Commerce and Tourism
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- CS by Banking and Insurance read 1st time
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- CS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 03/27/17, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Banking and Insurance; Commerce and Tourism; Rules
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (4)
+ − Amendment
395062 - Amendment (Delete All)
Delete everything after the enacting clause and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (2)
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 1298 Filed
- Yeas: 9
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 1298 c1
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor