+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1075 (Ch. 2016-233)
- Substituted CS/CS/HB 1075
- Read 2nd time
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/10/16
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
On March 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- CS by Appropriations read 1st time
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
- CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 03/03/16, 8:00 am, 412 Knott Building
On February 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Recommendation: CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
On February 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government, 02/24/16, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
On February 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government
- Favorable by Environmental Preservation and Conservation; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
On February 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Environmental Preservation and Conservation, 02/09/16, 1:30 pm, 37 Senate Office Building
On January 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On January 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Environmental Preservation and Conservation; Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; Appropriations
On January 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Amendments (7)
828838 - Amendment
Delete line 1940 and insert:
941904 - Amendment
Delete line 1944 and insert:
827052 - Amendment
Before line 245 insert:
631368 - Substitute Amendment (Delete All) (647570)
Delete everything after the enacting clause and insert:
588592 - Amendment to Substitute Amendment (631368)
Delete lines 1805 - 1822.
647570 - Amendment
Between lines 2983 and 2984 insert:
294294 - Amendment
Delete lines 2121 - 2122 and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (46)
- 73.015 - Presuit negotiation.
- 125.355 - Proposed purchase of real property by county; confidentiality of records; procedure.
- 166.045 - Proposed purchase of real property by municipality; confidentiality of records; procedure.
- 215.82 - Validation; when required.
- 215.965 - Disbursement of state moneys.
- 253.025 - Acquisition of state lands for purposes other than preservation, conservation, and recreation.
- 253.0251 -
- 253.027 - Emergency archaeological property acquisition.
- 253.03 - Board of trustees to administer state lands; lands enumerated.
- 253.031 - Land office; custody of documents concerning land; moneys; plats.
- 253.034 - State-owned lands; uses.
- 253.0341 - Surplus of state-owned lands to counties or local governments.
- 253.111 - Notice to board of county commissioners before sale.
- 253.42 - Board of trustees may exchange lands.
- 253.782 - Retention of state-owned lands in and around Lake Rousseau and the Cross Florida Barge Canal right-of-way from Lake Rousseau west to the Withlacoochee River.
- 253.7821 - Cross Florida Greenways State Recreation and Conservation Area assigned to the Office of the Executive Director.
- 253.7824 - Sale of products; proceeds.
- 253.87 -
- 259.01 - Short title.
- 259.02 - Authority; full faith and credit bonds.
- 259.03 - Definitions.
- 259.032 - Conservation and recreation lands.
- 259.035 - Acquisition and Restoration Council.
- 259.036 - Management review teams.
- 259.037 - Land Management Uniform Accounting Council.
- 259.041 - Acquisition of state-owned lands for preservation, conservation, and recreation purposes.
- 259.047 - Acquisition of land on which an agricultural lease exists.
- 259.101 - Florida Preservation 2000 Act.
- 259.105 - The Florida Forever Act.
- 259.1052 - Babcock Crescent B Ranch Florida Forever acquisition; conditions for purchase.
- 260.015 - Acquisition of land.
- 260.016 - General powers of the department.
- 369.317 - Wekiva Parkway.
- 373.139 - Acquisition of real property.
- 375.031 - Acquisition of land; procedures.
- 375.041 - Land Acquisition Trust Fund.
- 380.05 - Areas of critical state concern.
- 380.055 - Big Cypress Area.
- 380.508 - Projects; development, review, and approval.
- 589.07 - Florida Forest Service may acquire lands for forest purposes.
- 944.10 - Department of Corrections to provide buildings; sale and purchase of land; contracts to provide services and inmate labor.
- 957.04 - Contract requirements.
- 985.682 - Siting of facilities; criteria.
- 1013.14 - Proposed purchase of real property by a board; confidentiality of records; procedure.
- 373.089 - Sale or exchange of lands, or interests or rights in lands.
- 570.715 -
+ − Votes (3)
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 1290 Filed
- Yeas: 8
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 1290 Filed
- Yeas: 5
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 1290 Filed
- Yeas: 16
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor